NY A02662 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the environmental control board to adjudicate disputes between adjoining real property owners over the blocking of a driveway, the ownership or use of which is shared by such adjoining owners in the city of New York; further appoints another hearing officer to the board who shall be an attorney; defines the term "blocking".
Title
Authorizes the environmental control board to adjudicate disputes between adjoining real property owners over the blocking of a driveway, the ownership or use of which is shared by such adjoining owners in the city of New York; further appoints another hearing officer to the board who shall be an attorney; defines the term "blocking".
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Carl Heastie [D] |
Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Darryl Towns [D] |
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-12-16 | Assembly | print number 2662a |
2011-12-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00690 (Same As) 2012-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 690A