NY A02471 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle liability insurance policies to include supplemental spousal liability coverage unless the insured declines such coverage in writing.
Title
Requires motor vehicle liability insurance policies to include supplemental spousal liability coverage unless the insured declines such coverage in writing.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Asm. Ron Castorina [R] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01158 (Same As) 2015-01-09 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
S06574 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
S06574 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE