NY A02387 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows domestic insurers to make certain records available by electronic means if they are easily accessible from the insurer's principal office in this state and the insurer complies with all applicable state and federal laws and regulations.
Title
Allows domestic insurers to make certain records available by electronic means if they are easily accessible from the insurer's principal office in this state and the insurer complies with all applicable state and federal laws and regulations.
Sponsors
Asm. Erik Dilan [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.325 |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | print number 2387a |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02801 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE