NY A02338 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the state fund any program which imposes a mandate upon municipal corporations or school districts; establishes criteria for any exemption from such law if such mandate is ordered by the judiciary, pursuant to an executive order or requested by the locality.
Title
Requires that the state fund any program which imposes a mandate upon municipal corporations or school districts; establishes criteria for any exemption from such law if such mandate is ordered by the judiciary, pursuant to an executive order or requested by the locality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | print number 2338a |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02295 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - referred to local governments