NY A02183 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds that a person is guilty of computer tampering in the third degree when they intentionally enter or alter in any manner or destroy computer material indicating that a person did or did not receive a vaccination that is reported to the New York state immunization information system or the New York city immunization registry.
Title
Adds that a person is guilty of computer tampering in the third degree when they intentionally enter or alter in any manner or destroy computer material indicating that a person did or did not receive a vaccination that is reported to the New York state immunization information system or the New York city immunization registry.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Maryjane Shimsky [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Yudelka Tapia [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.65 |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.28 |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06731 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES