NY A01787 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-20)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account.
Title
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1787c |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1787b |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.573 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | print number 1787a |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to labor |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.80 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.209 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.209 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01945 (Same As) 2016-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 1945B