NY S01945 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 1945B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 1945B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account.
Title
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1945B |
2016-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1945A |
2016-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2015-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01787 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES