NY A01553 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - held for consideration in social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - held for consideration in social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.
Title
Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Vanessa Gibson [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] | Asm. William Boyland [D] |
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | held for consideration in social services |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | print number 1553a |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2011-01-10 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S03072 (Same As) 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3072A