NY A01539 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - substituted by s4082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - substituted by s4082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility under the New York state young farmers loan forgiveness incentive program; expands program to farmers who have produced agricultural products for no more than ten years.
Title
Relates to eligibility under the New York state young farmers loan forgiveness incentive program; expands program to farmers who have produced agricultural products for no more than ten years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | substituted by s4082 |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.589 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04082 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.620