NY S04082 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.620
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.620
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility under the New York state young farmers loan forgiveness incentive program; expands program to farmers who have produced agricultural products for no more than ten years.
Title
Relates to eligibility under the New York state young farmers loan forgiveness incentive program; expands program to farmers who have produced agricultural products for no more than ten years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.620 |
2022-11-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.589 |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | substituted for a1539 |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-08 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 4082 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4082A |
2022-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.279 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.721 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01539 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - substituted by s4082