NY A01269 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits children twelve years old and younger from playing tackle football.
Title
Prohibits children twelve years old and younger from playing tackle football.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-18 | Assembly | print number 1269c |
2018-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | print number 1269b |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | print number 1269a |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to health |