NY A01202 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - signed chap.624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - signed chap.624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that in addition to other penalties, individuals convicted of hate crimes shall undergo mandatory training or counseling in hate crime prevention and education.
Title
Establishes that in addition to other penalties, individuals convicted of hate crimes shall undergo mandatory training or counseling in hate crime prevention and education.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | Assembly | signed chap.624 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1360 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6570 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.69 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.290 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06570 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1202