NY A01202 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-08 - substituted by s14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-08 - substituted by s14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to out-of-state clinical laboratory practitioners.
Title
Relates to out-of-state clinical laboratory practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s14 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.59 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00014 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.247