NY A01150 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding autism as a covered condition for lawful medical use of marihuana.
Title
Relates to adding autism as a covered condition for lawful medical use of marihuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.64 |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.68 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02968 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH