NY A01093 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force on disasters; provides that such task force shall consist of twenty-three members.
Title
Creates a task force on disasters; provides that such task force shall consist of twenty-three members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.527 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1602 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4235B |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1093c |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1093b |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.790 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | print number 1093a |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.66 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.451 |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04235 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1093C