NY A00887 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the veterans' special disability fund to provide incentives to employers to hire veterans who were previously injured during active military duty.
Title
Establishes the veterans' special disability fund to provide incentives to employers to hire veterans who were previously injured during active military duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | print number 887a |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07038 (Same As) 2012-04-25 - REFERRED TO LABOR