NY A00860 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of economic development to give a preference to any tourist promotion agency that is promoting the sport of stickball.
Title
Authorizes the department of economic development to give a preference to any tourist promotion agency that is promoting the sport of stickball.
Sponsors
Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Michael Novakhov [R] | Asm. Brian Cunningham [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1137 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8895 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 860 |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | amended on third reading 860a |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.363 |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S08895 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A860