NY S08895 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of economic development to give a preference to any tourist promotion agency that is promoting the sport of stickball.
Title
Authorizes the department of economic development to give a preference to any tourist promotion agency that is promoting the sport of stickball.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A860 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1137 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00860 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY