NY A00368 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits state employees to be excused from work without loss of compensation for up to four hours to donate blood; permits supervisor to require proof of such donation.
Title
Permits state employees to be excused from work without loss of compensation for up to four hours to donate blood; permits supervisor to require proof of such donation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |