NY A00368 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows individuals receiving public assistance to be able to pursue a college education. Allows college course work to be credited as a work activity, which can be used toward fulfilling the employment requirements for public assistance benefits. Also changes the amount of time that a participant in a vocational school can spend in preparation for a GED from 25% to 50%.
Title
An act to amend the social services law, in relation to access to a college education by public assistance recipients who are subject to work participation requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to social services | |
2009-01-07 | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S2162 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
A10496 (Same As) 2010-04-02 - referred to higher education
A10496 (Same As) 2010-04-02 - referred to higher education