NY A00350 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would improve New York's business climate by providing for a program of small business crime prevention services and assistance.
Title
Establishes the small business crime prevention services to provide small businesses with information on strategies, best practices and programs offering training and assistance in prevention of crimes in and around the premises of small businesses or otherwise affecting small businesses, including but not limited to: assault, arson and other violent felony offenses; robbery, burglary, theft, identity theft and fraud; and vandalism, graffiti and other property damage; further provides that information on eligibility and applications for financial assistance be made available to small businesses; authorizes the New York state urban development corporation to provide loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to small businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or other organizations for the purpose of preventing crimes against small businesses or on the premises or in the vicinity of small businesses; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-26 | delivered to senate | |
2010-05-26 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-18 | advanced to third reading cal.732 | |
2010-03-16 | reported | |
2010-03-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-20 | committed to small business | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.21 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-26 | 3RD READING CAL.421 | |
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5041 | |
2009-04-22 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-04-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-04-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-09 | advanced to third reading cal.295 | |
2009-04-06 | reported | |
2009-03-03 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S5041 (Same As) 2009-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A350