NY A00113 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s5913a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s5913a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires menstrual products to be offered for free in non-public schools.
Title
Requires menstrual products to be offered for free in non-public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5913a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.667 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | print number 113a |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05913 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.31