NV SB82 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to prepaid or stored value cards. (BDR 14-266)
Title
Makes various changes relating to prepaid or stored value cards. (BDR 14-266)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 733 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-19 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 733.) To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 109.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=163 |