NV SB544 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2017-2019 biennium. (BDR 34-1189)
Title
Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2017-2019 biennium. (BDR 34-1189)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 394. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: None, Absent: 9.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1071.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |