NV SB48 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.
Summary
Repeals certain requirements regarding the delivery of cigarettes sold to consumers. (BDR 32-270)
Title
Repeals certain requirements regarding the delivery of cigarettes sold to consumers. (BDR 32-270)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60. | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-02 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-01 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. | |
2009-03-27 | In Assembly. | |
2009-03-25 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-24 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-23 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=75 |