NV SB443 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to increase the reimbursement rates for certain meals for aging persons who are food-insecure; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Appropriates money to increase rates of reimbursement for certain meal programs. (BDR S-728)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 552. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |