NV SB360 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for an interim study concerning energy efficiency programs and the financing of clean energy in this State. (BDR S-41)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for an interim study concerning energy efficiency programs and the financing of clean energy in this State. (BDR S-41)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 531.
2015-06-03SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-29AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-29AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2015-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-22SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 925.) To printer.
2015-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-03SenateExempt, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).
2015-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback