NV SB333 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to virtual currency; requiring a virtual currency business to register with the Commissioner of Financial Institutions before engaging in virtual currency business activity with or on behalf of a resident of this State; creating the Virtual Currency Recovery Account; authorizing the Commissioner to impose a civil penalty on a virtual currency business that engages in certain conduct; authorizing the Commissioner to award payments of restitution to certain residents who are victims of fraud committed by a virtual currency business; requiring a virtual currency business to provide certain disclosures to a resident before engaging in virtual currency business activity with or on behalf of the resident; prohibiting a person from engaging in certain conduct relating to the solicitation of virtual currency business activity; prohibiting a virtual currency business from engaging in certain advertisements or promotions; prohibiting a domestic life insurer from investing money allocated to certain accounts in virtual currency; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to virtual currency. (BDR 57-18)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 244.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |