NV SB298 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to inland ports; revising provisions relating to the creation, maintenance and operation of inland ports and inland port authorities; requiring the Office of Economic Development within the Office of the Governor to conduct an interim study concerning the viability of and funding options associated with developing inland ports in certain areas in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to inland ports. (BDR 22-536)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 362.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |