NV SB176 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental purchasing; revising the duties of the Commission to Study Governmental Purchasing; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Commission to Study Governmental Purchasing. (BDR 27-512)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 597 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 597.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 387 and 388.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |