NV SB174 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 191.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 191.
Summary
Exempts certain retired public employees who are serving as volunteer firefighters from certain consequences of reemployment with a public employer. (BDR 23-768)
Title
Exempts certain retired public employees who are serving as volunteer firefighters from certain consequences of reemployment with a public employer. (BDR 23-768)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 191. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-06 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=493 |