NV SB122 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a program to provide grants for family planning services. (BDR 40-630)
Title
Establishes a program to provide grants for family planning services. (BDR 40-630)
Sponsors
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Rep. Ellen Spiegel [D] | Rep. Michael Sprinkle [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 649 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 649.) To printer. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 579.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |