NV SB111 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires production of certain evidence under certain circumstances. (BDR 3-771)
Title
Requires production of certain evidence under certain circumstances. (BDR 3-771)
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Jones [D] | Sen. Ruben Kihuen [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] | Rep. Jason Frierson [D] |
Rep. Lucy Flores [D] | Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Andrew Martin [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-25 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 185.) To printer. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |