NV AB91 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to guardianships; establishing provisions concerning the sterilization of protected persons; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions concerning the sterilization of protected persons. (BDR 13-173)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09AssemblyChapter 17.
2019-05-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-06AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-15SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 39.) To printer.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2019-01-30AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-24AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback