NV AB8 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety; revising the frequency of reviews of the levels of supervision for probationers and parolees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the levels of supervision for probationers and parolees. (BDR 16-346)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 49. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-15 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |