NV AB63 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 143.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 143.
Summary
Makes various changes to provisions regarding justice courts. (BDR 1-398)
Title
Makes various changes to provisions regarding justice courts. (BDR 1-398)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 143. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) | |
2009-04-20 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 535.) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-20 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 24.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-11 | From printer. | |
2008-12-10 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=140 |