NV AB40 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to storage tanks; revising provisions governing responsibility for discharges from certain storage tanks; revising the requirements relating to the eligibility of a storage tank for the coverage of certain costs from the Fund for Cleaning Up Discharges of Petroleum; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to petroleum storage tanks. (BDR 40-343)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04AssemblyTo committee.
2021-02-01AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-11-18AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback