NV AB277 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; revising provisions relating to the exchange of medical and insurance information by certain persons involved in a claim for personal injury asserted under a policy of motor vehicle insurance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing insurance. (BDR 57-984)
Sponsors
Rep. Bea Duran [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. Selena Torres [D] | Rep. Cecelia Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Venicia Considine [D] | Rep. Shondra Summers-Armstrong [D] | Rep. Clara Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 553 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 553.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 370.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |