NV AB119 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Read second time.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to maternal health; revising the duties of the Maternal Mortality Review Committee; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the Maternal Mortality Review Committee. (BDR 40-740)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateRead second time.
2021-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2021-04-13SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2021-04-09AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-04-09AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 34.) To printer.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback