NV AB106 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to Crisis Support Services of Nevada for the employment of two additional full-time staff members by Crisis Support Services of Nevada; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to Crisis Support Services of Nevada. (BDR S-688)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6107/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB106.pdf |