NM SM24 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agency Support For Future Energy Careers
Title
Agency Support For Future Energy Careers
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-10 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:43 N:0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |