NM SM119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Office Of Outdoor Recreation
Title
Study Office Of Outdoor Recreation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by one or both houses |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Conservation |