NM SB485 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (69-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr 2) Ch.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (69-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr 2) Ch.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Nominating petition filing & resolution times
Title
Nominating petition filing & resolution times
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Passed House (69-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr 2) Ch.121. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (42-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |