NM SB447 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 220 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 220 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Engineering & Surveying Scholarship & License
Title
Engineering & Surveying Scholarship & License
Sponsors
Sen. Gregg Fulfer [R] | Sen. Ron Griggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 220 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-03-11 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HAFC |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |