NM SB423 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bed & breakfast beer & wine licenses
Title
Bed & breakfast beer & wine licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Passed House (68-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.150. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Passed Senate (37-3) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |