NM SB397 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.218.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.218.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Local liquor tax proceed uses & rates
Title
Local liquor tax proceed uses & rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.218. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Passed House (62-2) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (33-5) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |