NM SB35 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 10 - Mar. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 10 - Mar. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum Wage For Secondary School Students
Title
Minimum Wage For Secondary School Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 10 - Mar. 18 |
2021-03-14 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2021-03-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:25 |
2021-03-11 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-03 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-22 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HCEDC |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:15 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/STBT |