NM SB259 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Firearms For Orders Of Protection Subjects
Title
No Firearms For Orders Of Protection Subjects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (43-22) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (25-15) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |