NM SB259 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP/a API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP/a API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forfeiture of public official benefits
Title
Forfeiture of public official benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP/a API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HLC/HJC-HLC- DP-HJC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] w/drn | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SJC/SFC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=259&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0259.pdf |