NM SB155 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Powers Of Appointment Act
Title
Uniform Powers Of Appointment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 69 |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Passed House (67-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |